VA HB1359 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transit Capital Project Revenue Advisory Board. Establishes the Transit Capital Project Revenue Advisory Board (the Advisory Board) within the Department of Rail and Public Transportation to examine the effects of the loss of state transit capital funds and identify additional sources of revenue. The Advisory Board is required to provide both an interim and a final report on its work and findings. The Advisory Board expires on July 1, 2018.
Title
Transit Capital Project Revenue Advisory Board; established, report, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1359ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 14-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105997D-S1 (83-Y 14-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1359S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Carrico agreed to 16105997D-S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 16105997D-S1 (Carrico) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103888D |