VA HB1359 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care; consent to services and disclosure of records. Provides that an authorization for the release of health records shall remain in effect until (i) the authorization is revoked in writing and delivered to the health care entity maintaining the health record subject to the authorization, (ii) any expiration date set forth in the authorization, or (iii) the health care entity maintaining the health record becomes aware of any expiration event described in the authorization, whichever occurs first, and that a revocation shall not be effective to the extent that the health care entity maintaining the health record released health records prior to the delivery of such revocation. Health care; consent to services and disclosure of records. Provides that an authorization for the release of health records shall remain in effect until (i) the authorization is revoked in writing and delivered to the health care entity maintaining the health record subject to the authorization, (ii) any expiration date set forth in the authorization, or (iii) the health care entity maintaining the health record becomes aware of any expiration event described in the authorization, whichever occurs first, and that a revocation shall not be effective to the extent that the health care entity maintaining the health record released health records prior to the delivery of such revocation. The bill also provides that authorization for the release of health records shall include authorization for the person named in the authorization to assist the person who is the subject of the health record in accessing health care services, including scheduling appointments for the person who is the subject of the health record and attending appointments together with the person who is the subject of the health record. The bill also provides that every health care provider shall make health records of a patient available to any person designated by a patient in an authorization to release health records and that a health care provider shall allow a spouse, parent, adult child, adult sibling, or other person identified by a patient to make an appointment for medical services on behalf of such patient, regardless of whether such patient has executed an authorization to release health records.
Title
Health care; consent to disclosure of records.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 784 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1359ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 12-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 47-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (53-Y 47-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's substitute printed 22108155D-H2 |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1359ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 41-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22107081D-S1 (57-Y 41-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (29-Y 10-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1359S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107081D-S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107081D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1359H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106251D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106251D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-24 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104513D |
2022-01-24 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2969 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |