VA HB1368 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle engine idling. Allow engine idling of unattended motor vehicles on residential streets maintained by the Commonwealth if the idling is for the purpose or warming or cooling the interior of the vehicle.
Title
Vehicle engine idling; allowed for unattended motor vehicles on residential streets, exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-31 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10101566D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1368 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1368+hil |