VA HB1368 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers. Allows a retired law-enforcement officer to continue to receive his service retirement allowance during a subsequent period of employment by a local school division as a school security officer.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporated by Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1495-Torian) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101173D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1495 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0968)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1368 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1368+hil |