VA HB1371 | 2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1371
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Continued to 2025 in General Laws by voice vote
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Continued to 2025 in General Laws by voice vote
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; local arbitration agreements. Allows a participating locality, for any procurement solicitation or contract exceeding $10,000 for goods and services, to require the bidder or offeror to disclose certain information regarding pre-dispute arbitration clauses, defined in the bill, in employment, civil rights, and certain consumer disputes, and provides that a locality may consider the policies and practices related to arbitration of each bidder and offeror. The bill also provides that a participating locality shall require the bidder or offeror to provide written or electronic submissions to allow the locality to ascertain (i) whether the bidder or offeror requires persons with whom it is in a work relationship or prospective work relationship to sign or otherwise enter into a contract containing a pre-dispute arbitration clause that would cover an employment or civil rights dispute and (ii) whether the bidder or offeror requires consumers to sign or otherwise enter into a contract containing a pre-dispute arbitration clause as a condition of downloading mobile applications or using websites to pay a school district for goods, services, or fees. The bill authorizes a participating locality to cancel, terminate, or suspend, in whole or in part, the contract of any contractor that has violated a provision of the bill and to declare the contractor ineligible for further contracts with such locality for up to five years.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; local arbitration agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Continued to 2025 in General Laws by voice vote |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104101D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1371 (Carry Over) 2024-02-08 - Continued to 2025 in General Laws by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4377.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4377.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |