VA HB138 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-17 - Stricken from docket by Finance (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-17 - Stricken from docket by Finance (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Annual retail sales and use tax holiday. Establishes an annual retail sales and use tax holiday that takes place on the first full weekend in August beginning on August 1, 2025. During such weekend, state retail sales and use tax will not apply to certain (i) school supplies, (ii) clothing and footwear, (iii) qualified products designated as Energy Star or WaterSense, (iv) portable generators, or (v) hurricane preparedness equipment.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; establishes an annual tax holiday that takes place in August.
Sponsors
Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Tim Griffin [R] | Del. Ian Lovejoy [R] |
Del. Chris Obenshain [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | House | Stricken from docket by Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101706D |
Same As/Similar To
HB25 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
SB58 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB64 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB116 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
SB58 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB64 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB116 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)