VA HB1384 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Commission on Transportation Accountability. Removes obsolete provision requiring the Commonwealth to provide the Commission with "adequate office space."
Title
Transportation Accountability, Joint Commission on; removes obsolete provision.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 332 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1384ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2012-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100030D |