VA HB1384 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The New College Institute; operations and governance agreement with a public institution of higher education. Permits the New College Institute (New College) and any public institution of higher education to enter into an operations and governance agreement that may include (i) the merger of New College and the public institution of higher education on terms and conditions acceptable to each institution or (ii) the delegation or assignment of some or all of the duties of New College by New College to the public institution of higher education and the assumption of such duties by the public institution of higher education. The bill requires such operations and governance agreement to be subject to the approval of two-thirds of the members of the governing board of New College and two-thirds of the members of the governing board of the public institution of higher education.
Title
The New College Institute; operations and governance agreement with a public institution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-29 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104356D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1384 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1384+hil |