VA HB1385 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - House: Continued to 2011 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - House: Continued to 2011 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cemetery Board; exemptions. Exempts from licensure any person engaged in the resale of any grave or entombment right in a cemetery located in the Commonwealth provided the resale includes the complete transfer of all preneed burial contract rights associated with the grave or entombment right. The bill also removes the provision that deems an internment right abandoned if not used by the owner for a period of fifty years or more. Under current law in such cases the internment right is deemed to revert to the owner of a cemetery provided certain provisions of notice are followed by the cemetery owner.
Title
Cemetery Board; exemptions from licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | House: Continued to 2011 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-02-08 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-03 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104988D | |
2010-02-03 | House: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1385 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1385+hil |