VA HB139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Exceptions as to purchases from state correctional facilities. Allows exception for purchase of products by state agencies where the cost of purchase and installation is more than 10 percent over the cost of the product and the product is commonly commercially available, or the requisition made cannot be complied with on account of an insufficient supply of the articles or supplies.
Title
Correctional facilities, state; allows exception for purchase of products by state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2010-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101517D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB139 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB139+hil |