VA HB139 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
New media and technology innovation income tax credit. Establishes a new media and technology innovation income tax credit, starting with taxable year 2020, which is a nonrefundable tax credit for expenses related to producing in Virginia commercial advertisements, digital interactive media productions, and episodic television series. The bill allows a company to submit a single application for a project covering multiple tax years and requires such company to make available a third-party audit of its project-related expenses.
Title
New media and technology innovation; establishes income tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2019-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103146D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |