VA HB139 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Jure and De Facto Racial and Economic Discrimination Against African Americans; expiration. Extends from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2024, the expiration of the Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Jure and De Facto Racial and Economic Discrimination Against African Americans. The bill also provides for the nonlegislative citizen members of the Commission to continue to serve for the duration of the extension.
Title
Slavery & Subsqt. De Jure & De Facto Racial & Econ. Discrimination Against African Americans; study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 586 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB139ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100692D |
Same As/Similar To
SB151 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
SB151 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
SB151 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)