VA HB1415 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil penalty for demolition of historic structures. Authorizes any locality to adopt an ordinance establishing a civil penalty for the razing, demolition, or moving of a building or structure that is located in a historic district or that has been designated by a governing body as a historic structure or landmark in violation of an ordinance that no such building or structure shall be razed, demolished, or moved without the approval of a review board. The bill provides that such civil penalty shall not exceed the market value of the property as determined by the assessed value of the property at the time of razing, demolition, or moving of the building or structure. Civil penalty for demolition of historic structures. Authorizes any locality to adopt an ordinance establishing a civil penalty for the razing, demolition, or moving of a building or structure that is located in a historic district or that has been designated by a governing body as a historic structure or landmark in violation of an ordinance that no such building or structure shall be razed, demolished, or moved without the approval of a review board. The bill provides that such civil penalty shall not exceed the market value of the property as determined by the assessed value of the property at the time of razing, demolition, or moving of the building or structure.
Title
Historic structures; civil penalty for demolition.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Chad Green [R] |
Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 38-N) (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1415ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 38-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (62-Y 38-N) |
2024-04-05 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1415ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105076D |