VA HB1424 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Wireless telecommunications devices in motor vehicles. Extends prohibition on the use of wireless telecommunications devices in motor vehicles to talking on such device only when the device is configured for hands-free operation and is being used in the hands-free mode.
Title
Wireless telecommunications devices; extends prohibition on use in motor vehicles, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2010-10-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-10-27 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100431D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1424 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1424+hil |