VA HB1424 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Labeling of prescription drugs; purpose. Requires pharmacists to include on any label placed on the container in which any drug dispensed pursuant to a prescription is placed the purpose for which the drug has been prescribed and requires written prescriptions issued by prescribers to include the purpose for which the drug is prescribed.
Title
Prescription drugs; purpose of labeling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-11-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-11-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100208D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3408.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3410.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1424 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1424+hil |