VA HB1424 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
National Teacher Certification Incentive Reward Program and Fund; name; eligibility; incentive grant awards. Renames the National Teacher Certification Incentive Reward Program and Fund as the National Board Certification Incentive Reward Program and Fund, expands eligibility for incentive grant awards from such Fund pursuant to such Program from solely teachers who have obtained national certification from the National Board for Professional Teaching Standards to (i) all public school staff who are candidates for initial national certification or maintenance of national certification to cover certain costs of obtaining or maintaining such certification and (ii) all public school staff who have successfully obtained or maintained such certification. The bill also declares eligible for an annual incentive grant award in the amount of $7,500 all public school staff who have obtained or maintained such certification. Current law declares eligible for an annual incentive grant award of $5,000 in the first year and $2,500 in each subsequent year all teachers who have obtained or maintained such certification.
Title
National Teacher Certification Incentive Reward Program & Fund; eligibility, incentive grant awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2023-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101602D |