VA HB1449 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties. Provides that the ABC Board may grant a mixed beverage license, notwithstanding the requirement for a referendum, to properties (i) located as of December 1, 2012, within the Montgomery County Route 177 Urban Development Area, which area is adjacent to Exit 109 on Interstate 81, and (ii) on property fronting Route 603 with portions fronting on Interstate 81, located approximately 1,100 feet from the intersection of Route 603 and Interstate 81 at Exit 128 in Montgomery County.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1449ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 18-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming |
2012-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2012-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100062D |
Same As/Similar To
SB849 (Same As) 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)