VA HB1464 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1464
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local authority to restrict nutrient credit usage. Authorizes the governing body of any locality, by ordinance, to restrict the total nutrient credits that are generated in the locality and used in an adjacent eight-digit hydrologic unit code or fourth order subbasin to comply with stormwater nonpoint nutrient runoff water quality criteria.
Title
Restrict nutrient credit usage; local authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-29 | House | Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105223D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1464 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote