VA HB1467 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Baccalaureate public institutions of higher education; boards of visitors; membership. Requires the board of visitors of each baccalaureate public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to include two nonvoting, advisory representatives consisting of (i) one faculty member of the institution elected by the institution's faculty or such institution's faculty senate or its equivalent and (ii) one staff member of the institution selected by the institution's staff in the manner deemed appropriate by such staff members. The bill clarifies that such nonvoting, advisory faculty and staff representatives are separate and apart from the membership of the governing board of any such institution and are not counted in the membership of any such governing board. Baccalaureate public institutions of higher education; boards of visitors; membership. Requires the board of visitors of each baccalaureate public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to include two nonvoting, advisory representatives consisting of (i) one faculty member of the institution elected by the institution's faculty or such institution's faculty senate or its equivalent and (ii) one staff member of the institution selected by the institution's staff in the manner deemed appropriate by such staff members. The bill clarifies that such nonvoting, advisory faculty and staff representatives are separate and apart from the membership of the governing board of any such institution and are not counted in the membership of any such governing board.
Title
Higher educational institutions, baccalaureate public; membership of governing boards.
Sponsors
Del. Amy Laufer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1467ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24108200D-S1 (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1467S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108200D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108200D-S1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Higher Education |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1467H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107390D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107390D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104132D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |