VA HB147 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services; photo identification. Provides that the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) shall design and approve the issuance of photo-identification cards to every person who is issued a private security services registration by the Department. The photo-identification card shall contain the name, registration number, registration category, and photograph of the recipient; the date of issuance; the date of expiration; and the name of the issuer in the form "Department of Criminal Justice Services, Commonwealth of Virginia." The Department may enter into an agreement with the Department of Motor Vehicles to produce the photo-identification cards. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2017.
Title
Criminal Justice Services, Department of; issuance of photo-identification cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 197 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB147ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB147H1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104570D-H1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104570D-H1 |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101903D |
Same As/Similar To
SB424 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |