VA HB147 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum standards for local correctional facilities and Minimum standards for local correctional facilities and lock-ups; individuals in need of behavioral health or developmental services. Requires the State Board of Local and Regional Jails (the Board) to establish minimum standards for identification and care of individuals with developmental disabilities in local correctional facilities and procedures for enforcing such minimum standards, including requirements for (i) screening of individuals committed to local correctional facilities for developmental disabilities, (ii) referral of individuals committed to local correctional facilities for whom a screening indicates reason to believe the person may have a developmental disability to an appropriate provider for an assessment to determine whether the individual has a developmental disability and is in need of developmental services, and (iii) transfer of an individual determined to have a developmental disability and to be in need of developmental services from a local correctional facility to a facility at which appropriate developmental services are provided within 72 hours of completion of the assessment. The bill also requires the Board to amend standards governing the delivery of behavioral health services in local correctional facilities and lock-ups to provide that if an individual is assessed as being in need of behavioral health services, such individual shall be transferred from the local correctional facility or lock-up to a behavioral health facility within 72 hours of the assessment. Currently, standards governing behavioral health services in local correctional facilities and lock-ups require that if a person is assessed as being in need of behavioral health services, the local correctional facility or lock-up shall provide such services.
Title
Local correctional facilities and lock-ups; minimum standards.
Sponsors
Del. Bill Wiley [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Chris Runion [R] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred from Public Safety by voice vote |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103164D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Correctional Enterprises
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Correctional Enterprises
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction