VA HB1471 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Treatment Court Act; name change. Renames the Drug Treatment Court Act as the Recovery Court Act. The bill also directs the Supreme Court of Virginia to rename the state Drug Treatment Court Advisory Committee as the Recovery Court Advisory Committee.
Title
Drug Treatment Court Act; renames the Act as the Recovery Court Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105300D |
Same As/Similar To
HB292 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
SB725 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130)
SB725 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 251.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 254.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |