VA HB1480 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia-Ireland Advisory Board established; report. Creates the Virginia-Ireland Advisory Board to advise the Governor and General Assembly on ways to improve economic and cultural links between Virginia and Ireland, with a focus on the areas of commerce and trade, art and education, and general government. The bill requires the Board to submit an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly.
Title
Virginia-Ireland Advisory Board; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24100764D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports