VA HB1484 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School budgets. Conforms the county budget preparation and approval process to that of municipalities.
Title
Schools; approval of annual budgets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0143) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 143 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1484ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (90-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2015-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102917D |
Same As/Similar To
SB842 (Same As) 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)