VA HB1499 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 17 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Fees collected by the court; legal aid services. Increases the additional filing fees collected to fund legal aid services from $5 to $10.
Title
Legal aid services; increases fees collected by court therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-02-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 10-N) | |
2008-01-24 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-17 | House: Presented and ordered printed 088363588 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1499 |