VA HB1513 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-6)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-6)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Active-duty status for any service member injured while in the line of duty. Provides that the Adjutant General may maintain state active-duty status for any service member injured while in the line of duty during the course of a state active-duty mission who is unable to return to civilian employment for a period of up to 90 days after the date of the service member's injury. Active-duty status for any service member injured while in the line of duty. Provides that the Adjutant General may maintain state active-duty status for any service member injured while in the line of duty during the course of a state active-duty mission who is unable to return to civilian employment for a period of up to 90 days after the date of the service member's injury.
Title
Service members; active-duty status for any member injured while in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 226 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1513ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1513H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106266D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106266D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105825D |