VA HB1523 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prostitution; solicitation; penalties. Increases the penalty for a third or subsequent offense of solicitation of prostitution from an adult from a Class 1 misdemeanor to a Class 6 felony. The bill increases the fines from $100 to $1000 and from $500 to $2500 for certain offenses related to sex trafficking. The bill also make it a Class 5 felony to solicit prostitution from any minor. Prostitution; solicitation; penalties. Increases the penalty for a third or subsequent offense of solicitation of prostitution from an adult from a Class 1 misdemeanor to a Class 6 felony. The bill increases the fines from $100 to $1000 and from $500 to $2500 for certain offenses related to sex trafficking. The bill also make it a Class 5 felony to solicit prostitution from any minor. Under current law, any person who solicits prostitution from a minor is guilty of a Class 6 felony if the minor is 16 years old or older or a Class 5 felony if the minor is younger than 16 years old.
Title
Prostitution; solicitation, penalties, fees for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 25-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1523H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105793D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105793D-H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102385D |