VA HB1532 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voter registration; list of registered voters and persons voting at elections. Requires the Department of Elections to provide digital lists of all registered voters and of persons who voted at any primary, special, or general election held in the four preceding years at no cost and manually prepared paper lists at actual cost to certain persons. Under current law such lists are provided at a reasonable price.
Title
Voter registration; digital list of registered voters and persons voting at elections.
Sponsors
Del. Tim Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105019D |