VA HB1534 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Collection of town taxes by county. Authorizes the board of supervisors of any county that has adopted the urban county executive form of government to enter into agreements with towns located partially or wholly within such county for the collection and enforcement of real or personal property taxes by the county official responsible for assessment or collection of taxes. The authority granted to such counties is similar to authority granted to Loudoun County under existing law.
Title
Town taxes; collection by county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 504 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1534ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105339D |
Same As/Similar To
SB649 (Same As) 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)