VA HB16 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Safety belt system use in motor vehicles. Requires all occupants of motor vehicles to utilize a safety belt system. Current law requires the use of safety belts only by (i) occupants under the age of 18, (ii) drivers, and (iii) passengers 18 years of age or older occupying the front seat. The bill changes a violation of safety belt system requirements by a person occupying a front seat from a secondary offense to a primary offense.
Title
Safety belt system; all occupants of motor vehicles to utilize.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House: Incorporated by Transportation (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1414-Filler-Corn) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100628D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1414 (Similar To) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1230)