VA HB163 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles driving abreast. Provides that the prohibition on vehicles driving abreast does not apply to vehicles lawfully overtaking and passing vehicles traveling in the same direction in a separate lane.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibition on driving abreast does not apply to passing other vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110) | |
2010-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 110 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB163ER) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House (86-Y 12-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Printed as engrossed 10101500D-E | |
2010-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB163E | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 6-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101500D |