VA HB165 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional release of geriatric prisoners. Allows any prisoner serving a sentence imposed for a felony offense, other than a Class 1 felony, who has reached the age of 60 or older to petition the Parole Board for conditional release without regard to the number of years of his sentence he has served. Current law allows a 60-year-old prisoner to petition the Board after serving at least 10 years and a 65-year-old prisoner to petition the Board after serving at least five years of his sentence.
Title
Geriatric prisoners; those at 60 may petition Parole Board for conditional release.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2012-01-06 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-06 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101383D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB165 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB165+hil |