VA HB165 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Culpeper; November elections, town council, vice-mayor. Moves the date of election for the members of the town council, the mayor, and the vice-mayor from May to November beginning in 2017. The bill also substitutes the general law for certain charter provisions dealing with vacancies on the town council and in the office of mayor and substitutes "council member" for "councilman."
Title
Charter; Town of Culpeper.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 646 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB165ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-17 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101736D |