VA HB165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; loans to students; collection. Requires each public institution that makes a loan to a student to (i) include in loan documents for each such loan an individual plan for the repayment of principal and interest and the payment of any late fees and clear and detailed information about the collection process for such loan pursuant to the Virginia Debt Collection Act, including information about the agency or entity that is responsible for collection, and (ii) establish a process for notifying each student or, in the case of an undergraduate student and as appropriate, the student's parent of any loan payment that is past due no later than (a) 30 days after such payment becomes past due and (b) if necessary, the end of the academic term during which such payment becomes past due. The bill permits each such institution, with the consent of the borrower, to modify the terms of any loan for which payments are past due to provide for repayment forbearance on such loan and repayment to commence on a mutually agreed-upon date in the future.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; loans to students, collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 33-N) (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786) | |
2018-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 786 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB165ER) |
2018-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 33-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (62-Y 33-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Wexton agreed to |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101457D |