VA HB176 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0059)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0059)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tow truck drivers; violent crimes. Creates an exception to current law prohibiting the registration as a tow truck driver of any person convicted of a violent crime. The bill grandfathers those that already held a tow truck driver authorization under the former Board of Towing and Recovery Operators and who have not committed a subsequent violent crime. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Tow truck drivers; registration after conviction of violent crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0059) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 59 (effective 3/3/14) | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB176ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (92-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB176H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Emergency clause added |
2014-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104101D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104101D-H1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2013-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100738D |
Same As/Similar To
SB8 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Emergency Legislation
Motor Vehicles
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Emergency Legislation
Motor Vehicles