VA HB178 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Determination of tie votes; recounts; special elections. Provides that, in elections for the General Assembly and local offices, if two or more persons have an equal number of votes, and a higher number than any other person, there shall be a recount of the vote without any action being required by any of the candidates receiving the equal number of votes. The bill also provides that, except in the case of a recount of an election for Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or Attorney General, if the recount court finds that each party to the recount has received an equal number of votes, there shall be a special election held to determine which candidate is elected to the office. Only one recount of any election is permitted.
Title
Determination of tie votes; recounts, special elections.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Incorporated by Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB198-Price) by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102050D |
Same As/Similar To
HB198 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 674 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB178 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB178+hil |