VA HB180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Distracted driving; penalty. Expands the prohibition on manually entering multiple letters or text in a handheld communications device while operating a motor vehicle to also prohibit the manual selection of multiple icons and removes the condition that such manual entry is prohibited only if performed as a means of communicating with another person. The bill prohibits the operator of a motor vehicle from reading any information displayed on the device; current law prohibits reading an email or text message. The bill provides that this prohibition does not apply to reading any information displayed through the use of a global positioning system for the purpose of navigation. The bill eliminates the current exemption from the prohibition on using a handheld personal communications device while operating a motor vehicle when the vehicle is stopped or not moving; the current exemption from the prohibition when the vehicle is parked is not affected.
Title
Distracted driving; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101408D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1078.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 868 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 869.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |