VA HB185 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; registration permitted up to and including the day of the election. Repeals a provision that would permit any person who is qualified to register to vote to register to vote in person up to and including the day of the election, notwithstanding any deadline for the close of registration records. The repeal will limit the persons who are entitled to register to vote after the close of registration records to (i) any member of a uniformed service of the United States who is on active duty, (ii) any person residing temporarily outside of the United States, and (iii) the spouse or dependent residing with someone listed in (i) or (ii).
Title
Voter registration; registration permitted up to and including the day of the election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 8-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102235D |