VA HB189 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; Surfrider Foundation. Authorizes the issuance of revenue-sharing special license plates for supporters of the protection and enjoyment of oceans, waves, and beaches in Virginia through the Surfrider Foundation.
Title
License plates, special; issuance for supporters of Surfrider Foundation.
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Stolle [R] | Del. Barry Knight [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] | Del. David Yancey [R] |
Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Del. Scott Taylor [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. James Leftwich [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB189ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100419D-E |
2014-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB189E |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2013-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100419D |