VA HB190 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
Summary
Provisions for subdivision of a lot for conveyance to a family member. Includes stepchildren within the definition of "immediate family" for purposes of family subdivision provisions. This bill is identical to
Title
Subdivision of lot; stepchildren included as immediate family for conveyance thereof.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 717 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB190ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-04 | House: Delegates: Orrock, Crockett-Stark, Nichols | |
2008-03-04 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senators: Marsh, Quayle, Ticer | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-02-29 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (4-Y 92-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Senate amendment rejected by House (4-Y 92-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-24 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-18 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2007-12-26 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2007-12-26 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082010672 |
Same As/Similar To
SB230 (Same As) 2010-02-26 - House: Tabled in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB190 |