VA HB190 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority. Provides that the population criterion required for decisions of the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority shall be the estimates, not the projections, made by the Weldon Cooper Center for Public Service of the University of Virginia and provides that the population estimates shall be adjusted once the estimates are available for July 1 of the fifth year after the decennial census. Under current law, the population estimates are adjusted on July 1 of the fifth year, which requires use of the previous year's data.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; use of population estimate in connection with decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 224 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB190ER) |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105607D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB190S1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105607D-S1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105607D-S1 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102274D |
Same As/Similar To
SB413 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0375)