VA HB190 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; repeal of photo identification Voter identification; repeal of photo identification requirements; additional forms of identification accepted; signed statement in lieu of required form of identification; penalty. Removes the requirement that voters show a form of identification containing a photograph in order to be allowed to vote. The bill requires a voter to show one of the following: his voter registration confirmation documents; his valid Virginia driver's license, his valid United States passport, or any other identification issued by the Commonwealth, one of its political subdivisions, or the United States; any valid student identification card issued by any institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth or any private school located in the Commonwealth; any valid employee identification card containing a photograph of the voter and issued by an employer of the voter in the ordinary course of the employer's business; or a copy of a current utility bill, bank statement, government check, paycheck, or other government document that shows the name and address of the voter. A voter who does not show one of the required forms of identification when offering to vote is required to sign a statement that he is the named registered voter he claims to be in order to be permitted to cast a ballot. Such statement is signed subject to felony penalties for making false statements, punishable as a Class 5 felony. A voter who does not show one of the required forms of identification and does not complete or sign the statement shall be offered a provisional ballot according to the provisions of current law. The bill adds language regarding identification requirements for
Title
Voter identification; repeal of photo identification requirements, additional forms.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Incorporated by Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB19-Lindsey) by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103802D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 411.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB190 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB190+hil |