VA HB196 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; noncompliance with rental agreement; grace period prior to termination. Provides that if a landlord owns more than four rental dwelling units or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units, whether individually or through a business entity, in the Commonwealth, and a tenant named on the rental agreement is 65 years of age or older, the landlord may only terminate the rental agreement and proceed to obtain possession of the premises under the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act if such tenant fails to pay rent within 14 days after written notice is served on the tenant. Current law only provides a five-day grace period for such termination and applies such grace period to all tenants regardless of age.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; noncompliance with rental agreement, grace period.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB598-Price) by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103071D |