VA HB198 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recounts; special election to be held in the case of a tie vote. Provides that if, after a recount of an election, the recount court finds that each party to the recount has received an equal number of votes, there shall be a special election to determine which candidate is elected to the office. This provision would not apply in cases of tie votes occurring after a recount of an election for Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or Attorney General, which the Constitution of Virginia provides for, or for electors of President and Vice President of the United States, which will continue to be determined by lot.
Title
Recounts; special election to be held in the case of a tie vote, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB198ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108255D-S1 (52-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB198S1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108255D-S1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108255D-S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB198H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107626D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Incorporates HB692 (Simonds) |
2020-02-07 | House | Incorporates HB178 (Levine) |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107626D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101021D |
Same As/Similar To
HB178 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB692 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB692 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections