VA HB210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American cemeteries; Montgomery County and City of Radford. Adds two cemeteries in Montgomery County and one cemetery in the City of Radford to the list of cemeteries for which qualified organizations may receive funds from the Department of Historic Resources for the care of historical African American cemeteries and graves. The cemeteries are the Wake Forest Cemetery, which contains 40 eligible graves, and the Westview Cemetery, which contains 47 eligible graves, in Montgomery County and the Mountain View Cemetery, which contains 91 eligible graves, in the City of Radford.
Title
Historical African American cemeteries; adds a cemetery in Montgomery County and City of Radford.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 82 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB210ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-22 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100680D-E |
2020-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB210E |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100680D |