VA HB22 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; benefit ratio. Provides that an employer's payroll, for purposes of calculating its benefit ratio and state unemployment tax rate, shall be deemed to be $1 when the employer's taxable payroll for the applicable 12-month period is not more than $1. The measure eliminates the necessity of dividing the employer's benefit charges by a payroll amount of $0, which produces an infinite benefit ratio and results in an assessment of state unemployment taxes at the highest rate.
Title
Unemployment compensation; calculating an employer's benefit ratio.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191) | |
2014-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 191 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB22ER) |
2014-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-21 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) |
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-11-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100111D |