VA HB230 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment to industrial development authorities. Provides that in Frederick County the board of supervisors may appoint one of its members to the Economic Development Authority of the County of Frederick, Virginia. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Economic development authorities; appointment in Frederick County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 382 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB230ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102583D-E |
2014-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB230E |
2014-01-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-17 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102583D |
Same As/Similar To
SB311 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)