VA HB230 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judicial creation of trusts. Clarifies that a circuit court may create and establish a trust upon petition of an interested party. The bill states that its provisions are declarative of existing law.
Title
Trusts; a circuit court may create and establish upon petition of an interested party.
Sponsors
Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Del. Christopher Collins [R] | Del. William Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB230ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 16102680D-E |
2016-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB230E |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102680D |