VA HB230 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vote by mail; pilot program. Provides that the Department of Elections shall develop a pilot program for conducting elections by mail. In a vote by mail election, a ballot is mailed to every registered voter and the ballots are returned by the voters by mailing the ballot to the office of the general registrar, by delivering the ballot in person to the office of the general registrar, or by depositing the ballot at a drop-off location. The bill requires participating localities to provide a report on the pilot program in its locality to the State Board by December 1 of each year in which it participates. The bill requires the State Board to submit a report to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the House and Senate Committees on Privileges and Elections on the pilot program, including a recommendation as to whether all elections in the Commonwealth should be conducted by mail. The bill has an expiration date of December 31, 2021.
Title
Vote by mail; pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100904D |