VA HB230 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Applications for teacher licensure by reciprocity; Applications for teacher licensure by reciprocity; military spouses; timeline for determination. Requires the Board of Education's licensure regulations to provide for licensure by reciprocity for any spouse of an active duty or reserve member of the Armed Forces of the United States or a member of the Virginia National Guard who has obtained a valid out-of-state license, with full credentials and without deficiencies, that is in force at the time the application for a Virginia license is received by the Department of Education. Current law requires such regulations to provide for licensure by reciprocity for any spouse of an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the Commonwealth. The bill requires such an individual to submit an official copy of the military permanent assignment orders of the individual's spouse as part of the complete application packet. The bill requires the Department to determine and communicate such individual's eligibility for licensure by reciprocity within 15 business days of receipt of the complete application packet.
Title
Teachers; licensure by reciprocity for military spouses, timeline for determination.
Sponsors
Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Sen. Tara Durant [R] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB230ER) |
2022-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102411D |
Same As/Similar To
SB154 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
SB154 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
SB154 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)